U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bigback
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.