U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Curtis et al v. Eide Bailey, LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • September 23, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • September 16, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 03, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 22, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 11, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Vacate]
  • February 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.