U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Lawrence v. Capt. Bragg
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.