U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00032
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2008 Toyota Tundra, Vehicle Identification Number 5TFBV54128X063937 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 19, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 03, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Entry of Default]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Default]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 09, 2022: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.