U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Dahl v. Elanco Animal Health Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 04, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 10, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.