U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Cottonwood Environmental Law Center v. Erickson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2022: [Stay]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.