U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Everly et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Stay]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.