U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Keefe v. Lieze et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.