U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00009
  • Case Name: National Casualty Company v. Al Cameron Trucking, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • November 15, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • September 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Status Report Order]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 25, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 08, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.