U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Urry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.