U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Marsh v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Stay]
  • February 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.