U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:09-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nania
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.