U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-bk-40007-
  • Case Name: CASEY PENN SMITH
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • March 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Vacating Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2022
  • February 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • February 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.