U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00039
  • Case Name: McGowen Precision Barrels, LLC v. Proof Research, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Stay Discovery - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Patent/Trademark - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Remark]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 10, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.