U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Armagost v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • February 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.