U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Doud v. Everyday Auto LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Default Judgment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Pro Se Document]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • March 21, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Service]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 11, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.