U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baldry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Prob/SR (Form 34 and 35) - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.