U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Whitford v. O'Rino
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.