U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Hayes v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2023: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 16, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.