U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Porche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 25, 2022: [3731 Certification]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory - SDM]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.