U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Boggs et al v. City of Cut Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.