U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Butte Silver Bow County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.