U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Baham v. Xtant Medical Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 17, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Appear]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Change Venue]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 17, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.