U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Sussex Construction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 29, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 27, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 27, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.