U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acquittal ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Jury List ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • August 22, 2022: [Return of Service of Subpoena - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Show Cause ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 17, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 16, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 16, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • July 21, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.