U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Macias et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Detain - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 01, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.