U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Normile
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 24, 2022: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Stay - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.