U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.