U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montagna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.