U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Widner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.