U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear]
  • October 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Suppress ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • May 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.