U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.