U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bartlette et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Leave to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Quash ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.