U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cantrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Case No Longer Referred]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 29, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 27, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Letter from BOP]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.