U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Fryer et al v. UMIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Vacate]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.