U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Pederson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.