U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Dhillon Hotel v. The Sherwin-Williams Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 22, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.