U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Final Order in Garnishment - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Final Order in Garnishment - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Certificate of Service ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Writ ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.