U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Matranga v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 23, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 09, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Administrative Record]
  • May 06, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 23, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.