U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Marjamaa v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.