U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Morris v. Walmart Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Remand]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Remand]
  • March 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.