U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Matta v. Shf. Slaughter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Supplement - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 23, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 02, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.