U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Albertsons, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.