U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00018
  • Case Name: The Estate of Naomi Killsnight-Hiwalker et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Clarify - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2024: [Clarify - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.