U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Beck et al v. City of Whitefish et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 17, 2023: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Telephonic Status Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Vacate]
  • December 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Certify Class - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Appear]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 22, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.