U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Capital Trail Vehicle Association et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Administrative Record]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Modify - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Modify - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • May 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Intervene]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 11, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 25, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.