U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Guillen v. Mr. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 29, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.