U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standingrock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.