U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Kerley v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 28, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.