U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Londagin v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 29, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Remark]
  • June 29, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Administrative Record]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 28, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.